Leighton, Ross Kenneth (CPSO#: 53688)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 21 Oct 1991 to 31 Oct 1991
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 06 Dec 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jun 2001