Leis, Karen Sophie (CPSO#: 86066)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Department of Pediatrics Royal University Hospital 103 Hospital Drive Saskatoon, Saskatchewan S7N 0W8
Date Received: 17 Jun 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Apr 2007 to 04 May 2007
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 2010