Leitch, Madison Alexander Duncan (CPSO#: 107581)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Arva Clinic
14351 Medway Road
Arva ON  N0M 1C0
Phone: (519) 434-5007
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 24 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MADISON ALEXANDER DUNCAN LEITCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEITCH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Jul 2015 to 28 Sep 2015
Assessment Verification Period - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 05 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 05 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2017