Leiter, Lawrence Alan (CPSO#: 29253)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
61 Queen Street East
Suite 6121 Q
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-7441
Fax: (416) 867-3696
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leiter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Leiter ( CPSO# 29253 )

Business Address:
Suite 6-121
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-7441

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAWRENCE ALAN LEITER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEITER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1977