Leith, Eric Stephen (CPSO#: 30307)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 410
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone: (905) 842-6555
Fax: (905) 842-4190
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

MCI The Doctor's Office
205 Marycroft Avenue
suite 205
Woodbridge ON  L4L5X8
Canada
Phone: 905-856-2100
Fax: 905-856-2101
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Women's College Hospital
Allergy Clinic
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6137
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Diane Leith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Leith ( CPSO# 32515 )
Dr. E. Leith ( CPSO# 30307 )

Business Address:
Suite 401
960 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone Number: (416) 256-0132

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Clinical Immunology Effective: 06 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC STEPHEN LEITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEITH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1978