Lekas, Michael Chris (CPSO#: 73783)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2401 Yonge Street, #LL07
Toronto, Ontario, Canada
M4P 3H1
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: (647) 345-5590
Fax: (647) 345-5597
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL CHRIS LEKAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEKAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Mar 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 May 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2013 to 22 Jan 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2011