Lelli, Daniel Andrew (CPSO#: 88526)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 May 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1059 Carling Avenue
Rm C2174a
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613-798-5555 Ext. 18986
Fax: 613-761-5360
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 20 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL ANDREW LELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LELLI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 21 Jul 2011 to 20 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 21 Jul 2012 to 20 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 2014