Lemaire, Mathieu (CPSO#: 80911)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
SickKids Hospital - Nephrology
555 University avenue
Toronto, Ontario
M5G1X8 - Canada
Toronto ON  M5G 0A4
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 309419
Fax: (416) 813-6271
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATHIEU LEMAIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEMAIRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2010