Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lemieux, Camille Marie (CPSO#: 67894)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 May 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 May 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
399 Bathurst Street
3 West
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5888 Ext. 3
Fax: (416) 603-5448
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.M. Lemieux Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lemieux ( CPSO# 67894 )

Business Address:
3 West
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAMILLE MARIE LEMIEUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEMIEUX is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Jul 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2002