Lemieux, Jacques Philippe (CPSO#: 59238)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 May 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 May 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 May 1996