Lemieux, Julie (CPSO#: 79370)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 20 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2007