Lemire, Martine (CPSO#: 73766)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clinique des Specialistes Dix30
Local 510
9090 Boulevard Leduc
Brossard QC  J4Y 0E2
Phone: (450) 550-2334 Ext. 8527
Fax: (450) 672-4578

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 06 Feb 2009

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Jul 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology Effective: 08 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTINE LEMIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEMIRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2001