Lena, Tanya Suvendrini (CPSO#: 83022)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C A M H
Geriatric Mental Health Program
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 33656
Fax: (416) 583-1296
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Women's College Hospital
Center for Headache
76 Grenville Street Rm 571
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6136
Fax: (416) 323-6007
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.S. Lena Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Lena ( CPSO# 83022 )

Business Address:
CAMH
Geriatric Mental Health Program
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
Womens College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M2S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6136

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TANYA SUVENDRINI LENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LENA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2011