Lenck, Stephanie Solange Michele (CPSO#: 111432)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Feb 2017

Expiry Date:  31 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 29 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Pierre Et Marie Curie University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

France

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE SOLANGE MICHELE LENCK may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. LENCK is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. LENCK shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LENCK is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. LENCK shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. LENCK ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. LENCK ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 31 Jan 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2017 to 28 Mar 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 29 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2017 to 31 Jan 2018
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2018