Leneck, Charles Murray (CPSO#: 19993)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 03 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: SafeStor Records Management 2704 Hwy 20 Fonthill, ON L0S 1E6 Tel: 905-892-0010 Fax: 905-892-9465 Website: http://www.safestor.ca
Date Received: 01 Nov 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2014