Lenferna De La Motte, Pierre Georges (CPSO#: 105806)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 22 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. Matthew's University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
835 King St. W
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 742-3611
Electoral District: 03

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PIERRE GEORGES LENFERNA DE LA MOTTE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. LENFERNA DE LA MOTTE is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. LENFERNA DE LA MOTTE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LENFERNA DE LA MOTTE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. LENFERNA DE LA MOTTE shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. LENFERNA DE LA MOTTE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. LENFERNA DE LA MOTTE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 22 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018