Lennan, Carolyn Margaret (CPSO#: 56810)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Names: Lennan-Francis, Carolyn Margaret (used until: 16 Oct 1997 )     Lennan-Francis, Carolyn Margaret (used until: 23 Jun 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLYN MARGARET LENNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LENNAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1987