Lennox, Catherine Lynne (CPSO#: 70210)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
47 Liberty Street
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone: (905) 623-3331
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bowmanville Urgent Care Clinic
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Canada
Phone: (905) 623-6458
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Clarington Urgent Care Clinic
2320 Regional Highway 2
Bowmanville ON  L1C 0K5
Canada
Phone: (905)6971466
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lennox Moran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lennox ( CPSO# 70210 )
Dr. P. Moran ( CPSO# 70208 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Business Address:
Bowmanville Urgent Care Clinic
1100 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-6458

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 433-4370

Business Address:
Clarington Urgent Care Clinic
2320 Regional Highway 2
Bowmanville ON  L1C 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 697-1466

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE LYNNE LENNOX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LENNOX is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998