Lentini, Anthony Campallegio (CPSO#: 70199)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 218
223 Colonnade Road South
Ottawa ON  K2E 7K3
Phone: (613) 792-1525
Fax: (613) 792-3648
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Rehabilitation Centre
Ward B
Short Term Rehab Unit
505 Smyth Rd.
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-7350
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Rehabilitation Centre
505 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-7350 Ext. 5595
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Lentini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lentini ( CPSO# 70199 )

Business Address:
218 - 223 Colonnade Road South
Ottawa ON  K2E 7K3
Phone Number: (613) 792-1525

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY CAMPALLEGIO LENTINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LENTINI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001