Lenz, Frederick Arthur (CPSO#: 31397)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 23 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Aug 1989