Lenz, Radomila (CPSO#: 62145)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Dec 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1929 Russell Rd.
Suite 326
Ottawa ON  K1G 4G3
Phone: (613) 789-1299
Fax: (613) 789-7237
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RADOMILA LENZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LENZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1991