Leonard, Gregory John (CPSO#: 33737)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2670 Highway 43
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone: (613) 258-4947
Fax: (613) 258-2799
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G.J. Leonard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Leonard ( CPSO# 33737 )

Business Address:
2670 Highway 43
P.O. Box 1673
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-3430

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jul 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY JOHN LEONARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONARD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1982