Leonard, Jennifer Ruby (CPSO#: 78822)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 02 Feb 2003 to 28 Feb 2003
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Aug 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006