Leonard, Michael Patrick (CPSO#: 52843)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 1353
Fax: (613) 738-4271
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 17 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL PATRICK LEONARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONARD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 1999