Leone, Rosa (CPSO#: 56343)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Palermo, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2830 Keele Street
Suite 305
North York ON  M3M 3E5
Phone: (416) 243-2939
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rosa Leone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Leone ( CPSO# 56343 )

Business Address:
Suite 305
2830 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M3M 3E5
Phone Number: (416) 243-2939

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSA LEONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1988