Leong, Eric Wan Hay (CPSO#: 66468)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Gastrointestinal Endoscopy Unit
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 21600
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 308
1017 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3K 1Z1
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-7783
Fax: (416) 242-7672
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 200
4610 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7
Canada
Phone: (905) 856-2626
Fax: (905) 856-2602
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 17 Nov 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC WAN HAY LEONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997