Leong, Marissa Mei Ling (CPSO#: 89084)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C A M H
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Fax: 416-979-4685
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John C.S. Leong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Leong ( CPSO# 89084 )
Dr. S. Leong ( CPSO# 93209 )
Dr. J. Leong ( CPSO# 29249 )

Business Address:
110 - 100 Humber College Blvd.
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G4
Phone Number: (416) 745-5459


Corporation Name: Marissa Mei Ling Leong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Leong ( CPSO# 89084 )

Business Address:
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
1119 - 80 Workman Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARISSA MEI LING LEONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2013