Leong, Roger (CPSO#: 77517)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roger Leong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Leong ( CPSO# 77517 )

Business Address:
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROGER LEONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2007