Leong, Wey-Liang (CPSO#: 75410)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:Dalhousie University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite OPG 6-721
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2992
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 596-4200
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: (416) 340-4800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wey Liang Leong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Leong ( CPSO# 75410 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
Suite OPG 6-721
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2992

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 04 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WEY-LIANG LEONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2002