Leong, Yvonne Wai-Wan (CPSO#: 86544)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8223
Fax: 5196858771
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yvonne Leong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Leong ( CPSO# 86544 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
Suite B2-416
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8223

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YVONNE WAI-WAN LEONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2012