Leong-Poi, Howard Michael (CPSO#: 65521)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
6-044 Donnelly Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5845
Fax: (416) 864-5566
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Leong-Poi and I. Yang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Yang ( CPSO# 66538 )
Dr. H. Leong-Poi ( CPSO# 65521 )

Business Address:
245 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 3B7
Phone Number: (416) 488-1455

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Suite 6-044
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5845

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 15 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOWARD MICHAEL LEONG-POI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONG-POI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993