Leong-Sit, Peter Pak-Kian (CPSO#: 76500)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Department of Cardiology
P O Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3746
Fax: (519) 663-3782
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

London Cardiac Institute
Suite 302 - 256 Pall Mall Street
London ON  N6A 5P6
Canada
Phone: (519) 645-0146
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leong-Sit Manlucu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Manlucu ( CPSO# 80690 )
Dr. P. Leong-Sit ( CPSO# 76500 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Hospital
Department of Cardiology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3746

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 21 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER PAK-KIAN LEONG-SIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONG-SIT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2005