Leonhardt, Charlene Marie (CPSO#: 54244)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Main Floor
658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9
Phone: (905) 330-1853
Fax: (905) 335-1165
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Charlene Leonhardt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Leonhardt ( CPSO# 54244 )

Business Address:
Suite 408
658 Danforth Road
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9
Phone Number: (905) 330-1853

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLENE MARIE LEONHARDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONHARDT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1985