Leow, Margaret Poh Gaik (CPSO#: 80332)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Nov 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Nov 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Dublin, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2003 to 21 Jan 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 22 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 28 Nov 2004
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Nov 2004