Lepage, Patricia Allison (CPSO#: 56978)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Waypoint Mental Health Centre
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Phone: 7055493181 Ext. 2591
Fax: 7055490266
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patricia Lepage Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Lepage ( CPSO# 56978 )

Business Address:
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Phone Number: (705) 549-3181

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA ALLISON LEPAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEPAGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Sep 1999 to 31 Aug 2000
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2007