Lerman, Jerrold (CPSO#: 30903)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Buffalo
219 Bryant Street
Buffalo NY  14222
United States
Phone: (716) 878-7701
Fax: (716) 878-7316

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 10 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JERROLD LERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LERMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1983