Lerner, Marina (CPSO#: 90453)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Russian State Medical University (RSMU), 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HAMILTON SLEEP DISORDERS CLINIC
55 Frid St.
Unit #7
Hamilton ON  L8P 4M3
Phone: (905) 529-2259
Fax: 905-529-2262
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

SLEEP DISORDERS CLINIC
OF GREATER NIAGARA
282 Linwell Road
Suite 118
St Catharines ON  L2N 6N5
Canada
Phone: (905) 529-2259
Fax: 905-529-2262
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marina Lerner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lerner ( CPSO# 90453 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Sleep Disorders Clinic
Unit 7
55 Frid Street
Hamilton ON  L8P 4M3
Phone Number: (905) 529-2259

Business Address:
Sleep Disorders Clinic of Greater Niagara
Suite 118
282 Linwell Road
St Catharines ON  L2N 6N5
Phone Number: (905) 529-2259

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 19 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARINA LERNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LERNER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2014