Leroux, Nathalie Catherine (CPSO#: 71095)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brock University
Student Health Services
Harrison Hall
500 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 3A1
Phone: (905) 688-5550 Ext. 3243
Fax: (905) 688-6448
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Niagara College
Student Health Services
Room AH125
300 Woodlawn Rd
Welland ON  L3C 7L3
Canada
Phone: (905) 735-2211 Ext. 7635
Fax: (905) 736-6027
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATHALIE CATHERINE LEROUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEROUX is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1999