Leroux, Paul (CPSO#: 21290)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 27 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1962
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1963
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Mar 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001