Lesiuk, Howard John (CPSO#: 63354)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Feb 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Feb 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
Room C2210
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613-761-5383
Fax: 613-761-4332
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 06 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOWARD JOHN LESIUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LESIUK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Oct 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1991