Lesiuk, Lawrence Stephen (CPSO#: 60111)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Corporation
Hamilton General Division
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-0271
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Lesiuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lesiuk ( CPSO# 60111 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-0271

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAWRENCE STEPHEN LESIUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LESIUK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1990
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1991