Lesk, David Martin (CPSO#: 21318)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 17 Apr 1973 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 23 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1968
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 18 Feb 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016