Lesk, Mark Richard (CPSO#: 70910)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Ophtalmology
Maisonneuve - Rosemount Hospital
5415 boul Assomption
Montreal QC  H1T 2M4
Phone: (514) 252-3400 Ext. 4959
Fax: (514) 252-3905
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hopital Santa Cabrini
5655 Saint Zotique Est
montreal QC  H1T 1P7
Canada
Phone: 514-2526000
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 27 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK RICHARD LESK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LESK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1996
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2009