Lesley, Peter Alan (CPSO#: 58595)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Dec 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER ALAN LESLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LESLEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1989