Leslie, Ana Teresa Figueiredo Stochero (CPSO#: 86625)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universidade Federal de Sao Paulo, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Jun 2007 to 09 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2010