Leslie, Bruno (CPSO#: 86162)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidade Federal de Sao Paulo, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2007 to 23 Aug 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010