Leslie, Karen Mary (CPSO#: 57245)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C/O Division Of Adolescent Medicine
Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6083
Fax: (416) 813-5392
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN MARY LESLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LESLIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1988