Leslie, Kenneth Anderson (CPSO#: 59411)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioner Road East
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 667-6778
Fax: 519-667-6764
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kenneth Leslie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Leslie ( CPSO# 59411 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 667-6778

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH ANDERSON LESLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LESLIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1990
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1991