Lesoway, Robert Nicholas (CPSO#: 51425)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Oct 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 07 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 1992