Lessard, Janice Elsa (CPSO#: 56030)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1985

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 111
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone: (416) 724-8531
Fax: (416) 724-1885
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANICE ELSA LESSARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LESSARD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1985

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 20, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Update as of August 30, 2016: The member has completed all elements of this SCERP.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)